Date |
---|
|
24/5/2021 – Obhajoba DP 1, B3.073Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Jarmila Zimmermannová, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Omar Ameir, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Štefan Kolumber, Ph.D.
Assistent: Veronika Schusterová
|
24/5/2021 – Obhajoba DP 2, B2.431Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: Prof. Ing. Bohumil Král, CSc.
Board member: Mgr. Martin Fink
Board member: Mgr. Daniela Navrátilová, Ph.D.
Assistent: Ing. Veronika Sečková
|
24/5/2021 – Obhajoba DP 3, B3.075Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Adam Pawliczek, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Michal Menšík, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Lukáš Pavlík, Ph.D.
Assistent: Hana Dvořáková
|
24/5/2021 – Obhajoba DP 4, B3.074Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Jindra Peterková, Ph.D.
Board member: doc. RNDr. Martina Pavlačková, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Lenka Prachařová, Ph.D.
Assistent: Ing. Veronika Fišrová
|
31/5/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - EKK, B2.232Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Jarmila Zimmermannová, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Lenka Prachařová, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Jolana Skaličková, Ph.D.
Assistent: Ing. Michaela Nováková
|
31/5/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - MEMS, B2.231Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: Prof. Ing. Bohumil Král, CSc.
Board member: Mgr. Daniela Navrátilová, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Zuzana Repaská, Ph.D.
Assistent: Ing. Veronika Sečková
|
31/5/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - MNG, B2.233Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Adam Pawliczek, Ph.D.
Board member: Ekaterina Chytilova, Ph.D.
Board member: Mgr. et Mgr. Radim Weiss
Board member: Mgr. Jan Wossala, Ph.D.
Assistent: Mgr. Michaela Koutná
|
1/6/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - MEMS, B2.231Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: Prof. Ing. Bohumil Král, CSc.
Board member: Ing. Michal Menšík, Ph.D.
Board member: doc. Ing. Jindra Peterková, Ph.D.
Assistent: Hana Dvořáková
|
1/6/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - MNG, B2.233Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Adam Pawliczek, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Omar Ameir, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Lenka Prachařová, Ph.D.
Assistent: Veronika Schusterová
|
1/6/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr.- EKK, B2.232Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Jarmila Zimmermannová, Ph.D.
Board member: doc. Ing. Jarmila Duháček Šebestová, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Ingrid Majerová, Dr.
Assistent: Ing. Veronika Sečková
|
30/8/2021 – 30.8.2021 - Obhajoba DP - Micáková, Meeting Room 2Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Adam Pawliczek, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Omar Ameir, Ph.D.
Board member: Ekaterina Chytilova, Ph.D.
Board member: PhDr. Ing. Mgr. Renáta Pavlíčková, MBA
Assistent: Ing. Veronika Sečková
|
30/8/2021 – 30.8.2021 - Obhajoba DP - Vlasáková, Meeting Room 1Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Jarmila Zimmermannová, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Michaela Perunová
Board member: Ing. Richard Šmilňák, MBA
Assistent: Veronika Schusterová
|
2/9/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - EKK, B3.073Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: Prof. Ing. Bohumil Král, CSc.
Board member: Ing. Richard Šmilňák, MBA
Board member: Mgr. Jan Wossala, Ph.D.
Board member: doc. Ing. Jarmila Zimmermannová, Ph.D.
Assistent: Petra Steigerová, BA
|
2/9/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - MEMS, B3.074Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Jindra Peterková, Ph.D.
Board member: Ekaterina Chytilova, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Zuzana Repaská, Ph.D.
Assistent: Ing. Dominika Nagyová
|
2/9/2021 – SZZ - ústní - Mgr. - MNG, B3.075Type of studies: master's degree programme Committee:
Board chair: doc. Ing. Adam Pawliczek, Ph.D.
Board member: Ing. Omar Ameir, Ph.D.
Board member: Mgr. Daniela Navrátilová, Ph.D.
Assistent: Ing. Veronika Sečková
|